ME LD1671 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Compensating Susan Cloutier for Claims against the State
Title
Resolve, Compensating Susan Cloutier for Claims against the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-04-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) was ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-638). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-638), in concurrence. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs, in concurrence. |
2016-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |