ME LD1698 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Jobs and Slow Climate Change by Promoting the Production of Natural Resources Bioproducts
Title
An Act To Create Jobs and Slow Climate Change by Promoting the Production of Natural Resources Bioproducts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Reconsider RC #428 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #421 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #421 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 428 Yeas 14 - Nays 16 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Rules suspended for purpose of RECONSIDERATION |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2020-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 421 Yeas 19 - Nays 10 - Excused 6 - Absent 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-731) in concurrence |
2020-03-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-731) thereto. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-731) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-731) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | On further motion of the same Representative under further SUSPENSION of the RULES the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) was ADOPTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | On further motion of the same Representative under further SUSPENSION of the RULES the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED to be ENACTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subsequently, the RULES were SUSPENDED for the purpose of RECONSIDERATION. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending the motion to SUSPEND THE RULES. |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford MOVED that the RULES BE SUSPENDED for the purpose of reconsideration. |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1422) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator JACKSON of Aroostook. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) in concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (-552) Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-552). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-552) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-05-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |