ME LD1708 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent the Theft and Illegal Sale of Copper and Other Metals
Title
An Act To Prevent the Theft and Illegal Sale of Copper and Other Metals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-791) in concurrence. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-791) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-791) | |
2012-03-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2011. |