ME LD1711 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Territory of the Bayville Village Corporation
Title
An Act To Amend the Territory of the Bayville Village Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-02-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-02-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-02-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-02-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read ONCE |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |