ME LD1811 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Rules Governing the Medical Use of Marijuana Program
Title
An Act Regarding Rules Governing the Medical Use of Marijuana Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-11 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative HYMANSON of York the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2018-04-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-01-30 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2018-01-30 | House | Report READ. |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported by Representative HYMANSON for the Joint Standing Committee on Health and Human Services pursuant to Joint Order 2017, H.P. 1241. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1811&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1256&item=1&snum=128 |