ME LD183 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Number of Teachers in Maine
Title
An Act To Increase the Number of Teachers in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2019-02-12 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-12 | House | Representative KORNFIELD from the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=183&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0146&item=1&snum=129 |