ME LD193 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fully Fund and Restore State-Municipal Revenue Sharing
Title
An Act To Fully Fund and Restore State-Municipal Revenue Sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #137 (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #113 (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #113 (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-04 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-174). |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-174) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-174) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 137 (Yeas 98 - Nays 44 - Absent 6 - Excused 2) |
2019-05-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2019-05-28 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-260). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 113 (Yeas 89 - Nays 49 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-21 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-16 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-16 | House | Representative TIPPING of Orono moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |