ME LD1988 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide Critical Matching Funds for Child Care Services on the Northern Maine Community College Campus
Title
An Act to Provide Critical Matching Funds for Child Care Services on the Northern Maine Community College Campus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-07-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-07-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-26 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED Senate Amendment "A" (S-498). |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-498) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-498) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-240) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-240) was ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-240) |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-240). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-240). |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-240) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |