ME LD2000 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update the Designation of Vietnam War Remembrance Day
Title
An Act To Update the Designation of Vietnam War Remembrance Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Table Until Later RC #459 (Y: 76 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-03-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | Subsequently, under suspension of the rules and WITHOUT REFERENCE to a Committee, the Bill was READ TWICE and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-02-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 459 (Yeas 76 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2022-02-23 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME without reference to a Committee on Bills in the Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ ONCE without reference to a Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |