ME LD2102 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Municipalities by Repealing the Law Limiting the Municipal Property Tax Levy
Title
An Act to Support Municipalities by Repealing the Law Limiting the Municipal Property Tax Levy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #430 (Y: 74 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #586 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #586 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-560). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-560) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 430 (Yeas 74 - Nays 69 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2024-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2024-03-14 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2024-03-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-560) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-560) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 586 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . Roll Call Ordered |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senator NANGLE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Voted: ANT. DIV. REP |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-02-01 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-01-26 | Joint | Reported Out: REF TO SLG |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |