ME LD2104 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Charter of the Wiscasset Water District
Title
An Act to Amend the Charter of the Wiscasset Water District
Sponsors
Sen. Cameron Reny [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Edward Polewarczyk [R] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-599). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-599). |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-599) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-21 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |