ME LD214 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Governor William King Day
Title
An Act To Establish Governor William King Day
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Bartlett [D] | Sen. Lawrence Bliss [D] | Rep. Brian Bolduc [D] | Rep. Michael Clarke [D] |
Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Rep. Peter Kent [D] | Rep. Kerri Prescott [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-6) | |
2011-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-17 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-6) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-17 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-6) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-02-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-01 | (S) On motion by Senator Thomas of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2011-02-01 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |