ME LD2161 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make Technical Corrections to the Maine Juvenile Code, the Maine Criminal Code and the Intelligence and Investigative Record Information Act
Title
An Act to Make Technical Corrections to the Maine Juvenile Code, the Maine Criminal Code and the Intelligence and Investigative Record Information Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2024-03-12 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-06 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2024-01-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Beebe-Center of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-01-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-09 | House | Representative SALISBURY for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |