ME LD2193 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve Access to Affordable Wireless Communications by Allowing the Public Utilities Commission to Designate Eligible Telecommunications Carriers
Title
An Act to Improve Access to Affordable Wireless Communications by Allowing the Public Utilities Commission to Designate Eligible Telecommunications Carriers
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Steven Foster [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-562). |
2024-03-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-562). |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-562) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |