ME LD300 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Early Closures by Financial Institutions
Title
An Act Regarding Early Closures by Financial Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-01 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 1, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=300&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0213&item=1&snum=130 |