ME LD335 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the State To Distribute 12 Percent of Adult Use Marijuana Retail Sales and Excise Tax Revenue to Generating Municipalities
Title
An Act To Require the State To Distribute 12 Percent of Adult Use Marijuana Retail Sales and Excise Tax Revenue to Generating Municipalities
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Rep. Victoria Foley [D] | Rep. Chris Johansen [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - House - Enactment RC #270 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 270 (Yeas 88 - Nays 54 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) thereto. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) READ |
2019-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-484). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-484) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Chipman of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |