ME LD36 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Definition of "Timber Harvesting"
Title
An Act To Amend the Definition of "Timber Harvesting"
Sponsors
Sen. James Dill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-30 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-25). |
2021-03-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-25). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-25) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |