ME LD447 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Allow the Direct Sale of Shellfish to Retailers
Title
An Act To Allow the Direct Sale of Shellfish to Retailers
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler Clark [R] | Rep. Robert Eaton [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Kerri Prescott [R] |
Sen. Richard Rosen [R] | Rep. Dianne Tilton [R] | Rep. Windol Weaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-19 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-277) thereto in concurrence | |
2009-05-19 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-277) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-18 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-277) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) READ | |
2009-05-18 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-277) thereto | |
2009-05-14 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-277) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) On motion of Representative PERCY of Phippsburg, House Amendment "A" (H-277) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) was READ. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) On motion of Representative PERCY of Phippsburg, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative PERCY of Phippsburg REMOVED. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Damon of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |