ME LD48 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Clarify Provisions of the Cannabis Legalization Act Regarding Labels, Packaging and Testing
Title
An Act to Clarify Provisions of the Cannabis Legalization Act Regarding Labels, Packaging and Testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=48&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0040&item=1&snum=131 |