ME LD5 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Exclude Wildlife Issues from Citizen Initiatives
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Exclude Wildlife Issues from Citizen Initiatives
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Wood [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. Lance Harvell [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] | Rep. Abden Simmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-01-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-04 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=5&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0007&item=1&snum=128 |