ME LD533 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Statewide Voluntary Early Childhood Consultation Program
Title
An Act To Expand the Statewide Voluntary Early Childhood Consultation Program
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Michael Brennan [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] |
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-596) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-596) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-596) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-596) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-510). |
2022-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-510) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-02 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |