ME LD549 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Recognition of Corporate Entities for Tax Purposes
Title
An Act Regarding the Recognition of Corporate Entities for Tax Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=549&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0432&item=1&snum=125 |