ME LD607 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Direct the Department of Transportation to Examine Improving Highway Connections from Interstate 95 to the St. John Valley
Title
Resolve, to Direct the Department of Transportation to Examine Improving Highway Connections from Interstate 95 to the St. John Valley
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Albert [R] | Rep. Donald Ardell [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] |
Rep. Timothy Guerrette [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-411), in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-411) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-411). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |