ME LD673 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Direct the Maine Criminal Justice Academy to Develop a Nonresidential Law Enforcement Training Program
Title
An Act to Direct the Maine Criminal Justice Academy to Develop a Nonresidential Law Enforcement Training Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - House - Insist RC #106 (Y: 105 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Recede And Concur RC #105 (Y: 42 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #190 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-06-01 - House - Recede And Concur RC #105 (Y: 42 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #190 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) In NON-CONCURRENCE and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE |
2023-06-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 106 (Yeas 105 - Nays 36 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-01 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2023-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 105 (Yeas 42 - Nays 101 - Absent 7 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-01 | House | Motion of Representative GREENWOOD of Wales, to RECEDE AND CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) FAILED. |
2023-06-01 | House | Speaker TALBOT ROSS of Portland, moved to INSIST. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 190 Yeas 12 - Nays 18 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox moved to Accept The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |