ME LD733 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require Constitutional Officers To Be Elected by Statewide Election
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require Constitutional Officers To Be Elected by Statewide Election
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Josanne Dolloff [R] |
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #283 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 283 (Yeas 82 - Nays 60 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-03 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-03 | House | Representative MATLACK of St. George moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |