ME LD791 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Wind Energy Development Permitting
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Wind Energy Development Permitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-24 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2015-03-24 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-03-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-18 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2015-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=791&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0540&item=1&snum=127 |