ME LD794 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Survey State-contracted Providers of Therapeutic Foster Care in the State about Their Liability Insurance Needs
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Survey State-contracted Providers of Therapeutic Foster Care in the State about Their Liability Insurance Needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-501). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |