ME LD935 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Fair and Open Competition in Line Extension Construction
Title
An Act To Create Fair and Open Competition in Line Extension Construction
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Rep. Dean Cray [R] | Rep. Larry Dunphy [R] | Sen. Peter Edgecomb [R] |
Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Aaron Libby [R] |
Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-695), in concurrence. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) | |
2012-02-16 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) On motion of Representative FITTS of Pittsfield, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-29 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 125th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1190, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2011-06-29 | (H) Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 125th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1190. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Thibodeau of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |