ME LD989 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Maine's Tax Laws by Providing a Property Tax Exemption for Central Labor Councils
Title
An Act To Improve Maine's Tax Laws by Providing a Property Tax Exemption for Central Labor Councils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #419 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416). |
2020-03-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 419 Yeas 17 - Nays 11 - Excused 7 - Absent 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |