MI HB4042 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Assigned Pa 41'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Assigned Pa 41'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; food assistance; criteria for the issuance of Michigan bridge cards; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 10f & repeals sec. 10e of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.10e[1]).
Title
Human services; food assistance; criteria for the issuance of Michigan bridge cards; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 10f & repeals sec. 10e of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.10e[1]).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Assigned Pa 41'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-06-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/5/2013 @ 2:10 Pm |
2013-06-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/5/2013 @ 11:56 Am |
2013-05-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/23/2013 @ 10:20 Am |
2013-05-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-05-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2013-03-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Kelly |
Subjects
Human services, food assistance
Human services, fraud
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, fraud
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services