MI HB4081 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; legislative; retirement health care benefits for legislators; eliminate. Amends secs. 50b & 75 of 1957 PA 261 (MCL 38.1050b & 38.1075).
Title
Retirement; legislative; retirement health care benefits for legislators; eliminate. Amends secs. 50b & 75 of 1957 PA 261 (MCL 38.1050b & 38.1075).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2011-06-15 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/14/2011 |
2011-01-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-01-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Dian Slavens |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4081 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4081.htm |