MI HB4131 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; second parent adoption; provide for. Amends secs. 24 & 51 of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.24 & 710.51).
Title
Children; adoption; second parent adoption; provide for. Amends secs. 24 & 51 of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.24 & 710.51).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-02-05 | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2009 | |
2009-02-04 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-02-04 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-04 | Introduced By Representative Alma Smith |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-4131 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-4131.htm |