MI HB4137 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: indigent defense; definition of adult in Michigan indigent defense commission act; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2013 PA 93 (MCL 780.983).
Title
Criminal procedure: indigent defense; definition of adult in Michigan indigent defense commission act; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2013 PA 93 (MCL 780.983).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 59 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 59 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed Roll Call # 59 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Webber |