MI HB4162 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; signs; sign structures; exempt signs less than 40 square feet. Amends sec. 5 of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.305).
Title
Highways; signs; sign structures; exempt signs less than 40 square feet. Amends sec. 5 of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.305).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-02-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/03/2011 |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-02-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |