MI HB4230 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-13)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; deductions; initial angel investment minimum requirement; revise. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Title
Income tax; deductions; initial angel investment minimum requirement; revise. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2009-02-26 | Transmitted | |
2009-02-26 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 Yeas 104 Nays 3 | |
2009-02-26 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-02-26 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-02-26 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-11 | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced By Representative Dan Scripps |