MI HB4231 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Assigned Pa 61'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Assigned Pa 61'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; liability; waiver of claims of liability in connection with children's athletic and recreational activities; allow parent to sign. Amends 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1101 - 700.8206) by adding sec. 5109.
Title
Torts; liability; waiver of claims of liability in connection with children's athletic and recreational activities; allow parent to sign. Amends 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1101 - 700.8206) by adding sec. 5109.
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] | Rep. Stacy Oakes [D] | Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] |
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Alton Pscholka [R] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Rep. Pete Lund [R] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 159 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | House | Assigned Pa 61'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-06-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/21/2011 @ 3:58 Pm |
2011-06-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2011 @ 11:53 Am |
2011-06-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/8/2011 @ 2:24 Pm |
2011-06-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-06-07 | House | Roll Call # 159 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2011-06-07 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-01 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-06-01 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-06-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-03-16 | House | Transmitted |
2011-03-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2011-03-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-03-15 | House | Amended |
2011-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2011-02-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011 |
2011-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |