MI HB4239 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-12 - Assigned Pa 1'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-12 - Assigned Pa 1'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; administration; persons to whom agency information may be disclosed and assessment of solvency tax; revise. Amends secs. 11 & 19a of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.11 & 421.19a).
Title
Employment security; administration; persons to whom agency information may be disclosed and assessment of solvency tax; revise. Amends secs. 11 & 19a of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.11 & 421.19a).
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Constan [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Assigned Pa 1'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-12 | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/11/2009 @ 1:00 Pm | |
2009-03-12 | Approved By The Governor 3/11/2009 @ 11:47 Am | |
2009-03-11 | Presented To The Governor 3/11/2009 @ 9:12 Am | |
2009-03-10 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-03-10 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-03-10 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2009-03-10 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-03-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 40 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-03-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-03-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-03-05 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-05 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2009-02-26 | Transmitted | |
2009-02-26 | Title Amended | |
2009-02-26 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2009-02-26 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-02-26 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-02-26 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-02-26 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-02-11 | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Labor | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced By Representative Bob Constan |
Subjects
Employment security, administration
Records, other
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Records, other
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth