MI HB4326 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; definitions; definition of racketeering; expand to include identity theft and computer crimes. Amends sec. 159g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.159g).
Title
Crimes; definitions; definition of racketeering; expand to include identity theft and computer crimes. Amends sec. 159g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.159g).
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Bauer [D] | Rep. Larry DeShazor [R] | Rep. Lee Gonzales [D] | Rep. Gabe Leland [D] |
Rep. LaMar Lemmons [D] | Rep. Dudley Spade [D] | Rep. Jon Switalski [D] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2010-11-30 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-09-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-09 | Transmitted | |
2009-09-09 | Title Amended | |
2009-09-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 408 Yeas 105 Nays 2 | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-09-09 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2009-09-09 | Amendment(s) Not Adopted | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-07-15 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-19 | Printed Bill Filed 02/19/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced By Representative Lee Gonzales |