MI HB4361 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: credit; 1-time credit for organ donation; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding sec. 280.
Title
Individual income tax: credit; 1-time credit for organ donation; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding sec. 280.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2023 |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-04-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Felicia Brabec |