MI HB4371 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the crime of intentionally failing to document certain services in a medical record and performing certain medical treatments on a minor without consent and another individual present; enact. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4370'19, SB 0217'19
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the crime of intentionally failing to document certain services in a medical record and performing certain medical treatments on a minor without consent and another individual present; enact. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4370'19, SB 0217'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-09-19 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |