MI HB4384 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing; duties of the Michigan sentencing commission; provide for. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 34b to ch. IX. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4173'23
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing; duties of the Michigan sentencing commission; provide for. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 34b to ch. IX. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4173'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-14 | House | Rep. Luke Meerman Removed As Sponsor |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Luke Meerman |
Same As/Similar To
HB4173 (Same As) 2023-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety