MI HB4459 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Assigned Pa 4'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Assigned Pa 4'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; emergency contact information encoded in driver license; allow. Amends sec. 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.310).
Title
Traffic control; driver license; emergency contact information encoded in driver license; allow. Amends sec. 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.310).
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Rep. James Tedder [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] |
Rep. Jason Sheppard [R] | Sen. Tom Barrett [R] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Rep. David Maturen [R] |
Rep. Derek Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 5 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 259 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 259 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned Pa 4'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/2/2016 @ 4:00 Pm |
2016-02-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/2/2016 @ 3:38 Pm |
2016-01-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/25/2016 @ 12:52 Pm |
2016-01-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-01-20 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-01-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-01-20 | House | Roll Call # 5 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-01-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-01-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 259 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2015-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-04-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-04-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |