MI HB4487 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure: other; civil actions for criminal sexual conduct; provide exception to notice requirements for actions filed in the court of claims. Amends sec. 6431 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6431).
Title
Civil procedure: other; civil actions for criminal sexual conduct; provide exception to notice requirements for actions filed in the court of claims. Amends sec. 6431 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6431).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Helena Scott |