MI HB4540 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; registration; electronic submission of voter registration application; clarify processing of application. Amends secs. 509w & 509x of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509w & 168.509x). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4539'09
Title
Elections; registration; electronic submission of voter registration application; clarify processing of application. Amends secs. 509w & 509x of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509w & 168.509x). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4539'09
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-18 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight | |
2009-12-17 | Transmitted | |
2009-12-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 669 Yeas 68 Nays 36 | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-16 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-16 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-03-11 | Printed Bill Filed 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-03-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced By Representative Lesia Liss |