MI HB4550 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Assigned Pa 95 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Assigned Pa 95 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; guardians; national and state fingerprint checks; include in criminal record check for guardians. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 260 (MCL 722.874).
Title
Children; guardians; national and state fingerprint checks; include in criminal record check for guardians. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 260 (MCL 722.874).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 257 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Assigned Pa 95 With Immediate Effect |
2019-10-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/24/2019 09:04 Am |
2019-10-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/23/2019 03:45 Pm |
2019-10-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/14/2019 09:43 Am |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-10 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 257 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-10-10 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-10-08 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-05-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter |
Subjects
Children: guardians
Criminal procedure: records
Human services: children's services
Law enforcement: fingerprinting
Criminal procedure: records
Human services: children's services
Law enforcement: fingerprinting