MI HB4603 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Senate Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Senate Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Construction: other; use of design-build constructing for certain school buildings; allow. Amends secs. 1, 1a & 2 of 1937 PA 306 (MCL 388.851 et seq.).
Title
Construction: other; use of design-build constructing for certain school buildings; allow. Amends secs. 1, 1a & 2 of 1937 PA 306 (MCL 388.851 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2024-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 Yeas 95 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Tullio Liberati |
Subjects
Construction: other
Occupations: architects, professional engineers, and surveyors
State agencies (existing): talent and economic development
Occupations: architects, professional engineers, and surveyors
State agencies (existing): talent and economic development