MI HB4722 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-31 - Assigned Pa 216'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-31 - Assigned Pa 216'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Holidays: other; "Juneteenth National Freedom Day"; eliminate. Amends title & sec. 1 of 2005 PA 48 (MCL 435.361). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4457'23
Title
Holidays: other; "Juneteenth National Freedom Day"; eliminate. Amends title & sec. 1 of 2005 PA 48 (MCL 435.361). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4457'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 699 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 216'23 |
2023-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:34 Pm |
2023-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/22/2023 11:28 Am |
2023-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 09:32 Am |
2023-11-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2023-11-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 699 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-11-02 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2023 |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2023-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Helena Scott |
Same As/Similar To
HB4457 (Same As) 2023-12-31 - Assigned Pa 215'23