MI HB4785 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; dogs; service dogs for veterans; provide grant program. Creates new act.
Title
Animals; dogs; service dogs for veterans; provide grant program. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 829 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2018-12-13 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 829 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-12-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/20/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |
Subjects
Animals: dogs
Disabilities: other
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Veterans: other
Disabilities: other
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Veterans: other