MI HB4819 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; definition of energy field; expand to include green chemistry. Amends sec. 88q of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088q).
Title
State financing and management; funds; definition of energy field; expand to include green chemistry. Amends sec. 88q of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088q).
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Gregory [D] | Rep. Andrew Kandrevas [D] | Rep. Deb Kennedy [D] | Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] |
Rep. Lesia Liss [D] | Rep. Sarah Roberts [D] | Rep. Daniel Scripps [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2009-05-19 | Transmitted | |
2009-05-19 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 242 Yeas 100 Nays 9 | |
2009-05-19 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-05-19 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-05-13 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-22 | Printed Bill Filed 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2009-04-21 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-21 | Introduced By Representative Dan Scripps |
Subjects
Economic development, economic development corporations
State agencies (existing), environmental quality
State financing and management, funds
State agencies (existing), environmental quality
State financing and management, funds