MI HB4946 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-18 - Assigned Pa 170'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-18 - Assigned Pa 170'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; administration; definition of tax year for certain persons included in a unitary business group; clarify. Amends sec. 611 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.611).
Title
Income tax; administration; definition of tax year for certain persons included in a unitary business group; clarify. Amends sec. 611 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.611).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 379 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-18 | House | Assigned Pa 170'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-10-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/13/2011 @ 3:06 Pm |
2011-10-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/11/2011 @ 9:08 Am |
2011-10-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/6/2011 @ 3:46 Pm |
2011-10-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-10-05 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-10-05 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 379 Yeas 63 Nays 46 |
2011-10-04 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-10-04 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2011-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 Yeas 63 Nays 45 |
2011-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-09-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-09-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-09-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-09-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/14/2011 |
2011-09-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-09-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Jud Gilbert |
Subjects
Income tax, administration
Income tax, reporting
Income tax, returns
Michigan business tax, replacement
Income tax, reporting
Income tax, returns
Michigan business tax, replacement